+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper