+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 536
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 2022: House Vote #533 Local Calendar Immediately Transmit
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 15
February 17, 2022: House Vote #532 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 15
February 14, 2022: Senate Vote #507 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1