+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 1, 2022: Senate Vote #576 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor