+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 483
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper