+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 717
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2022: House Vote #897 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #871 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2022: Senate Vote #599 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor