+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 365
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor