+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor