+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 248
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #308 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
March 17, 2021: House Vote #258 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 152
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
February 16, 2021: Senate Vote #46 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor