+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 402
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper