+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 416
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper