+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 793
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #781 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 30, 2022: House Vote #811 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 159
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2022: Senate Vote #529 PASSAGE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 53
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor