+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2021: Senate Vote #60 MOTION TO ENGROSS: SB 40, SB 67, SB 184, & SB 188
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2021: Senate Vote #63 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 53
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor