+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 210
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Report Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 24th, 54th
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 47th, 21st
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Insisted
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper