+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 726
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2022: House Vote #804 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 147
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 25
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #549 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor