+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 600
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2022: House Vote #769 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 161
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 14
February 11, 2022: Senate Vote #505 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor