+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 371
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2022: House Vote #506 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 20
February 3, 2022: Senate Vote #471 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor