+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 448
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper