+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 728
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2022: House Vote #822 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 166
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 11
March 8, 2022: Senate Vote #596 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor