+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 11, 2022: Senate Vote #616 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor