+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 289
- Effective Date
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper