+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 11, 2022: Senate Vote #612 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor