+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 356
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted As Amended
- House Third Readers
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper