+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2022: Senate Vote #482 MOTION TO ENGROSS
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2022: Senate Vote #483 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 55
- Absent: 1