+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper