+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
February 14, 2022: Senate Vote #513 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor