+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper