+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 388
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor