+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 11, 2022: Senate Vote #614 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor