+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper