+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 790
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #780 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 30, 2022: House Vote #812 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 168
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2022: Senate Vote #503 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4