+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 640
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper