+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 29
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: House Vote #267 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 162
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 12
February 11, 2021: Senate Vote #40 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor