+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 447
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper