+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 820
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2022: Senate Vote #755 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
March 28, 2022: House Vote #791 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 155
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 12
February 1, 2022: Senate Vote #465 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor