+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 445
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper