+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 28
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2021: House Vote #289 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 164
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 10
February 11, 2021: Senate Vote #38 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 50
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor