+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
On December 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 7, 2022: Senate Vote #475 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor