+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On August 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act 563
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper