+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper