+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 596
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Third Readers
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #783 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
March 30, 2022: House Vote #816 TABLE
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 101
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
March 30, 2022: House Vote #818 Reconsider
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 101
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 10
March 30, 2022: House Vote #817 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
February 28, 2022: Senate Vote #564 ADOPTION OF AMENDMENT #1 BY THE SENATOR FROM THE 48th
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 34
February 28, 2022: Senate Vote #565 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor