+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper