+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 351
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Senate Third Read Lost
- Senate Third Read
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper