+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 485
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Reconsidered
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Notice to Reconsider
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper