+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper