+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Prefiled