+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper