+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Veto V3
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On June 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Postponed
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper