+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor