+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper