+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 624
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper